THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MARK'S WOODTHORPE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Religious Activities
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

16 Trustee(s)
40 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Nottinghamshire
Governance
- 18 September 2009: Previously excepted registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
16 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Bryan Mallows | Chair | 06 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Diana Mallows | Trustee | 27 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Philip Leek | Trustee | 27 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Daniel Fletcher | Trustee | 27 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Halina Cranston | Trustee | 27 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Gordon John Jeffrey | Trustee | 28 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sarah McNichol | Trustee | 23 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Kerri Ditchfield | Trustee | 24 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Gary Ditchfield | Trustee | 24 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Linda sheppard | Trustee | 26 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
Patricia Anne Simpson | Trustee | 19 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
Thomas Nigel BIRD | Trustee | 28 May 2012 |
|
|
||||
PATRICIA ANN FENTON | Trustee | 12 March 2004 |
|
|
||||
PETER DAVID FISHER | Trustee | 12 March 2004 |
|
|
||||
ALAN STUART | Trustee | 12 March 2001 |
|
|
||||
JACQUELINE DIANE CAREY | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £242.05k | £156.78k | £155.37k | £163.47k | £175.44k | |
|
Total expenditure | £223.82k | £174.46k | £156.24k | £150.68k | £166.76k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 21 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 21 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 15 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 15 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 22 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 22 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 04 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 04 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 08 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 08 May 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES
Charitable objects
Promoting in the ecclesiastical parish the whole mission of the Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
De Vere Gardens
Woodthorpe
Nottingham
NG5 4PH
- Phone:
- 01159267859
- Email:
- info@stmarksonline.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window