Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MARK'S WOODTHORPE
Charity Number: 1131702

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
16 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Bryan Mallows | Chair | 06 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Diana Mallows | Trustee | 27 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Philip Leek | Trustee | 27 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Daniel Fletcher | Trustee | 27 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Halina Cranston | Trustee | 27 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Gordon John Jeffrey | Trustee | 28 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sarah McNichol | Trustee | 23 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Kerri Ditchfield | Trustee | 24 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Gary Ditchfield | Trustee | 24 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Linda sheppard | Trustee | 26 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
Patricia Anne Simpson | Trustee | 19 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
Thomas Nigel BIRD | Trustee | 28 May 2012 |
|
|
||||
PATRICIA ANN FENTON | Trustee | 12 March 2004 |
|
|
||||
PETER DAVID FISHER | Trustee | 12 March 2004 |
|
|
||||
ALAN STUART | Trustee | 12 March 2001 |
|
|
||||
JACQUELINE DIANE CAREY | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.