Financial history PRESENCE THEATRE LIMITED

Charity number: 1132900
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2019 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023
Total gross income £10.17k £18.22k £5.07k £776 £4.17k
Total expenditure £8.82k £10.67k £1.86k £2.34k £5.29k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A