THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MARK, TUNBRIDGE WELLS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Regular public worship open to all. Pastoral work, visiting the sick and bereaved. Promotion of Christianity and the mission of the Church through sermons, courses and small groups, taking of Christian assemblies in schools, and provision of events for children and young people, activities for senior citizens, parent and toddler group. Supporting other charities in the UK and overseas.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £2,928 from 2 government grant(s)
People

13 Trustee(s)
35 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- East Sussex
- Kent
Governance
- 23 September 2009: Previously excepted registration
- ST MARK'S PCC, TUNBRIDGE WELLS (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Claire Louise Allwood | Chair | 08 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Carol Nicholson | Trustee | 12 May 2025 |
|
|
||||
Katie Victoria Trowsdale Mrs | Trustee | 19 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rosina Elizabeth Violet May Robinson Mrs | Trustee | 19 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Anna-Maria Taylor | Trustee | 19 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Edward Peltor | Trustee | 21 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
David Alexander Robertson | Trustee | 21 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Elaine Susan Cole | Trustee | 15 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Julia Jamie Hutchinson | Trustee | 15 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Louise Rose Garner | Trustee | 20 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Rosemary Clayton | Trustee | 20 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Deborah Marsden | Trustee | 28 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr Keith David John Root | Trustee | 28 April 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £119.00k | £112.48k | £121.43k | £143.24k | £167.20k | |
|
Total expenditure | £99.90k | £102.94k | £165.32k | £130.12k | £162.06k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | £14.19k | £9.28k | £2.93k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 19 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 19 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 15 August 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 15 August 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 10 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 10 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 04 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 04 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 29 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 29 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES
Charitable objects
Promoting in the ecclesiastical parish the whole mission of the Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Church Office
St Marks Road
Tunbridge Wells
Tunbridge Wells
Kent
TN2 5LU
- Phone:
- 01892 526069
- Email:
- office@stmarkschurch.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window