Accounts and annual returns THE FRIENDS OF THE YORK HOSPITALS

Charity Number: 500474
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 October 2019 13 July 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 06 November 2019 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 06 November 2019 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2018 21 November 2018 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 21 November 2018 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2017 06 November 2017 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required