THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF THE PRIORY CHURCH OF ST PETER AND ST PAUL LEOMINSTER

Charity Number: 1131837
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Regular public worship for all. The provision of sacred space for personal prayer. Pastoral work, including visiting the sick and the bereaved. Promoting the whole mission of the Church through provision of activities for senior citizens, parents and toddlers and other special need groups. Supporting other charities in the UK and overseas.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £194,037
Total expenditure: £232,624

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

One or more trustees receive payments or benefits from the charity for providing services to the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Religious Activities
  • Other Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Herefordshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 25 September 2009: Previously excepted registration
Organisation type:
Previously excepted
Other names:
  • PCC OF LEOMINSTER (Working name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

16 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Fr Guy Spenser Cole Chair 11 October 2021
E STANLEY HOLLAND CHARITY
Received: On time
Mark Jonathan Cracknell Simmons Trustee 05 February 2024
Community of the Cross of Nails (UK)
Received: On time
RECONCILIATION INITIATIVES
Received: On time
Hilary Roberts Trustee 03 April 2022
None on record
Kenneth Roberts Trustee 03 April 2022
None on record
Patrick Deeming-Kent Trustee 03 April 2022
None on record
Phillippa Wright Trustee 06 June 2021
THE MOTHERS UNION (DIOCESE OF HEREFORD)
Received: On time
Lesley Marsh Trustee 06 June 2021
None on record
Ceridwen Hibbert Trustee 06 June 2021
None on record
David Bland Trustee 03 March 2019
None on record
Kathy Bland Trustee 03 March 2019
None on record
Graham John Millard Trustee 23 April 2017
None on record
Helen Jane Bricknell Trustee 01 April 2016
None on record
Willian Quelch Trustee 01 April 2015
None on record
Richard David Phillips Trustee 31 October 2013
None on record
GEOFFREY THOMAS BRICKNELL Trustee 23 May 2011
PROCEEDS OF SALE OF LEOMINSTER CHURCH INSTITUTE
Received: On time
WENDY COOMBEY MBE Trustee
ASSOCIATION OF FESTIVAL CHURCHES
Received: 127 days late
PROCEEDS OF SALE OF LEOMINSTER CHURCH INSTITUTE
Received: On time
LEOMINSTER FESTIVAL SOCIETY
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £145.49k £192.59k £234.59k £141.90k £194.04k
Total expenditure £141.43k £155.43k £227.63k £168.62k £232.62k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £900 N/A N/A N/A £1.53k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 30 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 30 October 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 30 June 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 30 June 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 22 September 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 22 September 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 25 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 25 October 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 03 November 2020 3 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 03 November 2020 3 days late Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Leominster Team Ministry Office
Forbury Chapel
Church Street
LEOMINSTER
Herefordshire
HR6 8NQ
Phone:
01568 612124