Penarth Ministry Area

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Penarth Ministry Area is a parish of the Church in Wales. It is a Christian Church comprising the former parishes of All Saints,Penarth, Holy Nativity,Penarth, Saint Augustine,Penarth, Saint Dochdwy,Llandough and Saint Peter Old Cogan We facilitate services at our church buildings and community activities in our church halls. We provide pastoral care available to the local community in Penarth
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
Total income includes £5,000 from 1 government grant(s)
People

14 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Vale Of Glamorgan
- Lesotho
- Tanzania
- Uganda
Governance
- 08 March 2010: Previously excepted registration
- 11 January 2023: Funds received from 1130979 THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL...
- NO (Working name)
- PARISH OF PENARTH ALL SAINTS PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL (Previous name)
- Penarth Ministry Area (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Keith Ingram | Trustee | 22 April 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Elyn Hannah | Trustee | 22 April 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Hugh Bryant | Trustee | 25 April 2023 |
|
|||||||
Neil Pugh | Trustee | 01 April 2023 |
|
|||||||
Jane McLaughlin | Trustee | 01 April 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Dr Len Smart | Trustee | 01 April 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Jan Cullen | Trustee | 01 April 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Robert Graham Court | Trustee | 01 January 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Rev James Andrew Watkin-Young | Trustee | 01 January 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Rev Mark Jones | Trustee | 01 January 2022 |
|
|||||||
Huw Rhys Charles Williams | Trustee | 01 January 2022 |
|
|||||||
Patricia Ann Humphrey | Trustee | 20 April 2021 |
|
|||||||
Christian Richard Matthew Salisbury | Trustee |
|
||||||||
MELANIE TUKE GRIFFIN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £212.81k | £205.57k | £292.00k | £406.71k | £438.56k | |
|
Total expenditure | £202.96k | £164.92k | £319.00k | £373.80k | £363.95k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £500 | £5.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 10 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | 10 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 25 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 25 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 24 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 24 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 10 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 10 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 13 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 13 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 31 MARCH 1920 as amended on 07 Jul 2021 as amended on 07 Jul 2021
Charitable objects
The promotion of the whole mission of the Church, pastoral, evangelistic, social and ecumenical, in the parish.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
All Saints Church
Victoria Square
Penarth
CF64 3EL
- Phone:
- 029 2070 3170
- Website:
-
allsaintspenarth.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window