Financial history ASSOCIATION FOR GLYCOGEN STORAGE DISEASE (UK) LIMITED

Charity number: 1132271
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £205.80k £122.88k £131.75k £143.72k £242.28k
Total expenditure £217.13k £141.67k £144.85k £156.76k £197.55k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A