Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF OAKLEY WITH WOOTTON
Charity number: 1131064

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
16 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Claire Bowers | Trustee | 22 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Erika Conti | Trustee | 22 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Ann Elizabeth Wilson | Trustee | 22 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Serena Catherine Worthington | Trustee | 22 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rev Ceri Deosun | Trustee | 17 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Mark Thomas | Trustee | 27 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Barbara Robson | Trustee | 27 March 2023 |
|
|||||
Selina Craig | Trustee | 28 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Thomas Favell | Trustee | 28 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Teresa Bates | Trustee | 28 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Goucher | Trustee | 28 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Rev Ben Kautzer | Trustee | 30 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Kathryn Rose Butler | Trustee | 20 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
SIMON JOHN CONSTANTINE | Trustee | 28 March 2017 |
|
|||||
Helen Miller | Trustee | 28 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
MARK PERYER | Trustee |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.