KIDLINGTON BAPTIST CHURCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Advancement of Christian faith according to principles of the Baptist Union through regular public worship, Bible study, preaching, teaching, pastoral care, celebration of the Lord's Supper, Believer's Baptism, mission - local, national & international. Teaching, encouragement.& inclusion of young people. Fostering relations with Baptists & other Christians. Supporting charitable social action.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

13 Trustee(s)
110 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Oxfordshire
Governance
- 16 October 2009: Previously excepted registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Philip Durrant | Chair | 11 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Graham Guy | Trustee | 22 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Gordon Norridge | Trustee | 19 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Downs | Trustee | 19 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Gillian Chisnall | Trustee | 25 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rosslyn Dawn Avery | Trustee | 24 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Timothy Gordon Croft | Trustee | 25 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Anita Adeniran | Trustee | 25 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rodney Shepherd | Trustee | 24 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
John Miller | Trustee | 19 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Graham Barnett | Trustee | 19 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Antony Bray | Trustee | 30 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Jacqueline Mary Nobbs | Trustee | 22 May 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £150.87k | £142.18k | £152.59k | £177.63k | £203.70k | |
|
Total expenditure | £146.40k | £139.69k | £152.29k | £168.49k | £172.27k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | £1.22k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £3.40k | £6.19k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 18 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 18 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 12 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 12 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 24 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 24 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 14 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 14 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 09 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 09 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 26 JULY 2009 as amended on 24 Nov 2021
Charitable objects
The principal purpose of the Church is the advancement of the Christian faith according to the principles of the Baptist denomination. The Church may also advance education and carry out other charitable purposes in the United Kingdom and/or other parts of the world.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
Kidlington Baptist Church
High Street
KIDLINGTON
Oxfordshire
OX5 2DS
- Phone:
- 01865374983
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window