TEESSIDE AND DISTRICT CHURCH EXTENSION FUND
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
CHURCH EXTENSION GRANTS
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2022
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Stockton-on-tees
Governance
- 26 November 1970: Standard registration
- 31 July 2024: Removed (Funds spent (by trustees))
No other names
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2018 | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 05 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 18 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 21 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 6 OCTOBER 1970
Charitable objects
GRANTS IN THE FORM OF OUTRIGHT GIFTS OR OF LOANS FOR THE PURCHASE AND EXTENSION OF SITES USED FOR THE PURPOSES OF THE CHURCH OF ENGLAND IN THE RURAL DEANERIES OF GUISBOROUGH, MIDDLESBOROUGH, STOCKTON, STOKESLEY, AND OTHER AREAS INCLUDED IN THE COUNTY BOROUGH OF TEESIDE.
Area of benefit
SEE OBJECTS
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window