THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ROTHWELL, LEEDS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Regular public worship open all Provision of sacred space for personal prayer and contemplation Pastoral work including visits to sick and bereaved Teaching of Christianity through sermons courses and small groups Taking of religious assemblies in schools Provision of a youth club with a Christian ethos Promotion of Christianity through the staging of events and meetings Supporting other charities
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

15 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Leeds City
Governance
- 18 August 2009: Previously excepted registration
- HOLY TRINITY CHURCH PCC, ROTHWELL, LEEDS (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
15 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Roger Ward | Trustee | 28 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Carl David Burwell | Trustee | 28 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Adam James Burwell | Trustee | 28 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ian Richard Land | Trustee | 25 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Abhijit David | Trustee | 25 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Richard Howell Mayers | Trustee | 14 July 2016 |
|
|
||||
Susan Franks | Trustee | 06 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
VIRGINIA FRANCES HARVEY LYNCH | Trustee | 16 August 2012 |
|
|
||||
KEITH JOHN LYNCH | Trustee | 16 August 2012 |
|
|
||||
CAROL ANNE CRESSALL BA HONS | Trustee | 16 August 2012 |
|
|
||||
JENNIFER WARD | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PATRICIA ANN SHUTE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
NORMA BARRETT | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MARK WILKINSON BSC HONS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JOYCE BLAKEY | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £256.78k | £106.15k | £146.87k | £359.42k | £267.09k | |
|
Total expenditure | £251.96k | £147.06k | £190.17k | £233.41k | £457.07k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £1.14k | £4.29k | £1.88k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 05 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 05 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 12 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 12 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 11 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 11 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 13 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 13 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 27 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 27 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES
Charitable objects
Promoting in the ecclesiastical parish the whole mission of the Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
9 NEW WINDSOR DRIVE
ROTHWELL
LEEDS
LS26 0HU
- Phone:
- 01132826704
- Email:
- sue.holytrinity@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window