HESSLE AMATEUR OPERATIC AND DRAMATIC SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Arts and culture. Mainly in East Riding of Yorkshire.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

10 Trustee(s)
75 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- East Riding Of Yorkshire
Governance
- 05 March 1970: Standard registration
- HESSLE THEATRE COMPANY (Working name)
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Nicola Wilson | Chair | 09 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
David Gillyon-Powell | Trustee | 20 September 2024 |
|
|||||
Mark Gillyon-Powell | Trustee | 20 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Colin Thompson | Trustee | 11 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Richard Foot | Trustee | 11 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
RICHARD CARMICHAEL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JOHN DRURY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MRS JAN PRYBODA | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MARTIN HENRY BEAUMONT | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
KAREN TINA TODMAN | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £31.59k | £18.23k | £76.72k | £60.66k | £82.65k | |
|
Total expenditure | £36.48k | £7.91k | £65.63k | £78.76k | £70.57k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 05 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 05 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 04 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 04 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 16 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 16 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 15 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 17 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 17 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
RULES ADOPTED 1 DECEMBER 1969
Charitable objects
TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC IN THE DRAMATIC AND OPERATIC ARTS AND TO FURTHER THE DEVELOPMENT OF PUBLIC APPRECIATION AND TASTE IN THE SAID ARTS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED - IN PRACTICE HALTEMPRICE AND DISTRICT
Contact information
- Address:
-
20 CROFT DRIVE
ANLABY
HULL
HU10 7DZ
- Phone:
- 01482656466
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window