Accounts and annual returns ME 2 YOU BEREAVEMENT AND LOSS CHARITY

Charity Number: 1132462
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 October 2012 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2012 Not submitted
Annual return 31 October 2011 21 November 2011 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2011 07 August 2012 On Time
Annual return 31 October 2010 02 November 2010 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2010 Not Required