Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF FOLKESTONE HOLY TRINITY WITH CHRIST CHURCH
Charity number: 1131472

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
16 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev ROBERT PRICE WELDON | Chair | 27 January 2016 |
|
|||||
Rev HEATHER TAPSELL | Trustee | 01 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rev WILLIAM FRANCIS MILLS | Trustee | 01 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
LEWIS ANTHONY SMITH | Trustee | 01 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
RICHARD STANLEY LAMBOURNE | Trustee | 07 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
PATRICIA MARY WILSON | Trustee | 19 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
PAUL ARTHUR LESLIE SEWARD | Trustee | 19 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL STONEHAM HAWKEN | Trustee | 19 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Charles Martin | Trustee | 21 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Christine Anne Schilder | Trustee | 18 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
MICHELLE ELAINE FLETCHER | Trustee | 20 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Heather Sheila Sutherland | Trustee | 05 April 2018 |
|
|||||
DAVID TROKE | Trustee | 20 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
TIM PARSONS | Trustee | 27 April 2014 |
|
|||||
DENIS DADSON | Trustee |
|
||||||
Rev ROGER OWEN SMITH BA DIP RS | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.