THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST NICHOLAS WARWICK

Charity number: 1131835
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Church in Warwick

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £195,126
Total expenditure: £304,409

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

One or more trustees receive payments or benefits from the charity for providing services to the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Warwickshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 25 September 2009: Previously excepted registration
Organisation type:
Previously excepted
Other names:
  • ST NICHOLAS WARWICK PCC (Working name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

14 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev Linda Jean Duckers Chair 04 May 2011
WARWICK RELIEF IN NEED CHARITY
Received: On time
THE WARWICK & BUDBROOKE CHURCHES COMMUNITY OUTREACH POOL
Received: On time
Carole Rosina Ellis Trustee 19 May 2024
None on record
Pamela Ann Meale Trustee 19 May 2024
None on record
Robert James Perkins Trustee 06 October 2020
None on record
Antoine Philip Mitchell Trustee 06 October 2020
None on record
Dr Anita Nora Carmel Morgan Trustee 04 September 2018
THE COVENTRY DIOCESAN BOARD OF FINANCE LTD
Received: On time
CHRIS FOY Trustee 30 April 2017
None on record
KATIE JELFS Trustee 30 April 2017
None on record
ROY CAMPBELL EMMERSON Trustee 01 July 2014
None on record
JONATHAN GREIG FORBES Trustee 13 April 2014
None on record
FIONA TREWICK Trustee 13 April 2014
None on record
Sarah bazin Trustee 04 May 2011
THE COLLEGE OF MEDICINE
Received: On time
THE WARWICK & BUDBROOKE CHURCHES COMMUNITY OUTREACH POOL
Received: On time
ROSETTA LIFE
Received: On time
ANNE HEANEY Trustee 04 May 2011
None on record
JANE MARGARET ROGERS Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £134.60k £110.42k £122.13k £125.29k £195.13k
Total expenditure £144.39k £88.87k £91.19k £83.27k £304.41k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £250 N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 07 June 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 07 June 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 30 April 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 30 April 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 25 April 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 25 April 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 08 May 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 08 May 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 11 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 11 October 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
ST NICHOLAS CHURCH
ST. NICHOLAS CHURCH STREET
WARWICK
CV34 4JD
Phone:
01926419905