LIVING WORD CHRISTIAN CHURCH - UK

Charity Number: 1133421
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

CHRISTIAN BIBLE-BASED WORSHIP

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 01 February 2024

Total income: £8,424
Total expenditure: £12,047

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Stoke-on-trent City

Governance

Registration history:
  • 31 December 2009: Previously excepted registration
Organisation type:
Previously excepted
Other names:
  • LWCC-UK (Working name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
HEHERSON SANCHEZ Chair 11 September 2016
None on record
Zerbert Templado Trustee 01 September 2020
None on record
Rhine Gavas Trustee 11 September 2016
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 01/02/2020 01/02/2021 01/02/2022 01/02/2023 01/02/2024
Total gross income £9.98k £12.48k £11.24k £10.00k £8.42k
Total expenditure £8.24k £7.04k £9.34k £9.49k £12.05k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 01 February 2024 09 November 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 01 February 2024 Not Required
Annual return 01 February 2023 09 November 2024 344 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 February 2023 Not Required
Annual return 01 February 2022 30 November 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 01 February 2022 Not Required
Annual return 01 February 2021 01 April 2022 121 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 February 2021 Not Required
Annual return 01 February 2020 25 January 2021 55 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 February 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
59 Norris Road
Stoke-on-Trent
ST6 7AS
Phone:
07872950071