RIPON CHORAL SOCIETY
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Ripon Choral Society is a community choir which enables people living in this area to learn and perform some of the great choral music written over the centuries. People of all ages are welcome, and judging by the number of singers in the choir (approx. 160) it is meeting a need. The Choir's 4 performances each year enable other people to hear this choral music performed to a high standard.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2019
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Economic/community Development/employment
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- North Yorkshire
Governance
- 10 August 1971: Standard registration
- 29 April 2021: Removed (Funds transferred (incor))
- 29 April 2021: Funds transferred to 1185859 RIPON CHORAL SOCIETY
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2015 | 31/07/2016 | 31/07/2017 | 31/07/2018 | 31/07/2019 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £52.64k | £49.81k | £52.23k | £62.77k | £69.01k | |
|
Total expenditure | £54.16k | £54.69k | £55.56k | £50.64k | £67.98k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2019 | 20 March 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2019 | 20 March 2020 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 July 2018 | 06 February 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2018 | 06 February 2019 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 July 2017 | 25 April 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2017 | 25 April 2018 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 9 JUNE 1971
Charitable objects
TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC IN THE ARTS AND SCIENCES, AND IN PARTICULAR THE ART AND SCIENCE OF CHORAL MUSIC, BY THE PRESENTATION OF CHORAL CONCERTS AND OTHER ACTIVITIES.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED - IN PRACTICE RIPON
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window