Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF DIBDEN
Charity number: 1131535
Up to date
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
15 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev PETER SHERIDAN STARK TOLLER | Chair | 22 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
Gerard Paulett Murphy | Trustee | 08 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Michael John Gibson | Trustee | 08 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Philip Andrew Long | Trustee | 15 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Regardt Willer | Trustee | 15 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Adrian Keith Pennells | Trustee | 26 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Michael Hutchinson | Trustee | 26 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Anne-Marie Murphy | Trustee | 26 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Paul Lionel Carter | Trustee | 26 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
David Snocken | Trustee | 16 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Michael David Needham | Trustee | 21 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Jacqueline Ruth Besley | Trustee | 21 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Nicola Davies | Trustee | 21 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Joanna Frances Snocken | Trustee | 24 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
John Douglas ARMITAGE | Trustee | 30 April 2014 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.