THE NATIONAL YOUTH JAZZ COLLECTIVE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
NYJC was established to advance, develop and maintain public education in and appreciation of jazz music in all its aspects, for young people and others, and to raise the aspirations of young musicians. Our main activity is a week-long summer school in August each year.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £150,877 from 3 government grant(s)
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 22 March 2010: Standard registration
- NYJC (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Professor Jonathan Andrew Vaughan | Trustee | 07 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Andrea Joan Gray | Trustee | 07 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Dr Sarah Esme Pannell | Trustee | 02 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Greg Vincent Aiello | Trustee | 02 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Daniel Mar-Molinero | Trustee | 07 May 2019 |
|
|||||
JAMES ANTHONY MARK JOSEPH | Trustee | 11 January 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £173.19k | £161.32k | £212.36k | £203.26k | £231.38k | |
|
Total expenditure | £163.73k | £118.19k | £185.50k | £190.84k | £213.88k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £124.69k | £125.88k | £125.88k | £125.88k | £150.88k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 13 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 13 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 14 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 14 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 12 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 12 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 20 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 20 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 26 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 26 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 3 AUGUST 2009
Charitable objects
THE COMPANY'S OBJECTS ("THE OBJECTS") ARE TO ADVANCE, IMPROVE, DEVELOP AND MAINTAIN PUBLIC EDUCATION IN AND APPRECIATION OF JAZZ MUSIC IN ALL ITS ASPECTS, FOR YOUNG PEOPLE AND OTHERS, AND RAISE THE ASPIRATIONS OF YOUNG MUSICIANS BY (A) ARRANGING JAZZ PERFORMANCES IN VENUES TO WHICH YOUNG PERSONS MAY BE ADMITTED; (B) PROVIDING JAZZ WORKSHOPS AND SUMMER SCHOOLS FOR YOUNG PEOPLE, AND OPPORTUNITIES FOR PUBLIC PERFORMANCE BY YOUNG JAZZ MUSICIANS; (C) PROVIDING TRAINING FOR MUSIC TEACHERS, DEVELOPING A NATIONAL NETWORK OF EXPERT JAZZ EDUCATORS, AND FOSTERING AND SUPPORTING NATIONAL AND REGIONAL OUTREACH PROJECTS; (D) PROVIDING GUIDANCE AND SUPPORT FOR YOUNG MUSICIANS; AND BY SUCH OTHER MEANS AS THE COMPANY MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, NATIONAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
Leicester's creative hub
LCBDepot
31 Rutland Street
Leicester
LE1 1RE
- Phone:
- 07870 383776
- Email:
- admin@nyjc.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window