HEADINGTON BAPTIST CHURCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity (church) provides regular public worship and other Christian services, it engages in evangelism and mission, it offers education for Christian and community service, and it supports charitable social action.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
90 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Oxfordshire
Governance
- 21 August 2009: Previously excepted registration
- HBC (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Beryl Smart | Trustee | 10 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rachel Clare Edwards-Grundy | Trustee | 19 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Chimereze Okorie Chima | Trustee | 19 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Alastair William Howard | Trustee | 19 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
David Keith Scott | Trustee | 15 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Matthew Cyril John Warmington | Trustee | 01 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca Mary Bradshaw | Trustee | 11 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Rev Ian James McDonald | Trustee | 01 August 2020 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan George van den Broek | Trustee | 12 March 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £278.05k | £378.38k | £333.22k | £314.04k | £331.27k | |
|
Total expenditure | £309.26k | £293.15k | £919.81k | £334.26k | £328.87k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 08 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 08 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 21 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 21 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 26 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 26 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 20 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 20 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 30 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 15 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 2 JUN 2009 as amended on 11 Sep 2018
Charitable objects
The principal purpose of the Church is the advancement of the Christian faith according to the principles of the Baptist denomination. The Church may also advance education and carry out other charitable purposes in the United Kingdom and/or other parts of the world.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
Headington Baptist Church
78 Old High Street
Headington
OXFORD
OX3 9HW
- Phone:
- 01865763572
- Email:
- admin@hbc-oxford.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window