LYTHAM ST ANNES RELIEF IN SICKNESS CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Lytham St. Annes Relief In Sickness Charity provides one off grants to people living in Fylde Borough. Grants range from £50 to £800 and they are only given for equipment/training or household appliance. The applications must evidence that there is some physical or mental health need and verified by a medical report.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 14 January 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Lancashire
Governance
- 15 January 1971: Standard registration
- 11 July 2011: Removed (Does not operate)
- 03 August 2011: Re-registered
- 09 July 2016: Removed (Does not operate)
- 04 October 2016: Re-registered
- ST ANNES SICK AID SOCIETY (Previous name)
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PATRICIA ANNE FIELDING | Chair | 01 September 2013 |
|
|
||||
ELIZABETH OCONNOR | Trustee | 12 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
marjorie Stainton | Trustee | 11 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
MARGARET LILIAN GREENFIELD | Trustee | 01 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
NEIL HARRISON | Trustee | 01 September 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 14/01/2020 | 14/01/2021 | 14/01/2022 | 14/01/2023 | 14/01/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.02k | £2.54k | £2.48k | £1.73k | £6.49k | |
|
Total expenditure | £270 | £1.82k | £1.01k | £1.21k | £1.45k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 14 January 2024 | 24 December 2024 | 40 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 14 January 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 14 January 2023 | 08 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 14 January 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 14 January 2022 | 09 February 2023 | 87 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 14 January 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 14 January 2021 | 09 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 14 January 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 14 January 2020 | 04 March 2021 | 110 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 14 January 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF 13 NOVEMBER 1973
Charitable objects
RELIEVING CASES OF NEED PERSONS WHO ARE SICK CONVALESCENT, DISABLED, HANDICAPPED OR INFIRM BY PROVIDING OR PAYING FOR ITEMS, SERVICES OR FACILITIES WHICH ARE CALCULATED TO ALLEVIATE THE SUFFERING OR ASSIST THE RECOVERY OF SUCH CASES BUT ARE NOT READILY AVAILABLE TO THEM FROM OTHER SOURCES
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED IN PRACTICE ST ANNES-ON-SEA
Contact information
- Address:
-
C/O JILL WALKER
FYLDE YMCA
ST. ALBANS ROAD
ST ANNES ON SEA
FY8 1XD
- Phone:
- 01253895115
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.