THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST CATHARINE, GLOUCESTER

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
ST CATHARINE'S EXISTS TO GIVE EVERYONE THE OPPORTUNITY TO EXPERIENCE THE LOVE OF GOD IN JESUS CHRIST AND TO RESPOND. WE SEEK TO GROW NEARER TO GOD TOGETHER THROUGH A VARIETY OF LOVING AND JOYFUL WORSHIP. WE PROVIDE NURTURE AND SUPPORT FOR ALL THROUGH CARE AND PRAYER. WITH GOD'S HELP WE LOVE AND SERVE THOSE WITHIN AND BEYOND THE PARISH. WE PLAY OUR PART IN THE WORLD WIDE CHURCH.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

15 Trustee(s)
60 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Gloucestershire
Governance
- 17 November 2009: Previously excepted registration
- ST CATHARINE'S GLOUCESTER (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
15 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Steven Wang | Trustee | 01 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Charles William Paddy | Trustee | 21 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jane Orr | Trustee | 21 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Tina Hewitt | Trustee | 21 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Palfreyman | Trustee | 30 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
John Weygang | Trustee | 30 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Simon Philip Cozens | Trustee | 30 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Josephine Sanders | Trustee | 30 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Bruce Mackay Matheson | Trustee | 30 April 2023 |
|
|||||
Jean Margaret Morgan | Trustee | 15 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Clare Negreira | Trustee | 18 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dorothy Margaret Henshaw | Trustee | 18 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
David Norman Nicholls | Trustee | 04 October 2020 |
|
|||||
EDMUND MICHAEL REED | Trustee | 24 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
Rachel Barton | Trustee | 31 May 2013 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £145.41k | £170.97k | £231.37k | £213.40k | £164.56k | |
|
Total expenditure | £142.79k | £154.14k | £207.52k | £227.25k | £166.40k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £500 | £21.36k | £5.00k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 04 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 04 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 26 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 26 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 25 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 25 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 23 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 23 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 29 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 29 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES
Charitable objects
Promoting in the ecclesiastical parish the whole mission of the Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
St. Catharines Church
London Road
GLOUCESTER
GL2 0RR
- Phone:
- 01452302438
- Email:
- dnicholls@stcatharine.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window