THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST GEORGE, JESMOND.

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We offer facilities for local groups and organisations. We work with people of all ages and abilities. We offer worship and pastoral care.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

13 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Newcastle Upon Tyne City
Governance
- 17 November 2009: Previously excepted registration
- JESMOND, ST GEORGE'S PCC (Working name)
- Conflicting interests
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Deborah Loughran | Trustee | 07 October 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Alison Mattinson | Trustee | 28 April 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Nigel Vincent Russell-Sewell | Trustee | 30 April 2023 |
|
|||||||
Dr LANA YAN JUN LIU PhD | Trustee | 30 April 2023 |
|
|||||||
Prof Janet Wilson | Trustee | 31 May 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Hilary Margaret Cullingford | Trustee | 24 April 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Ian David Ness | Trustee | 24 April 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Michael Leonard Ranson JP, FCA | Trustee | 20 September 2021 |
|
|||||||
Margaret Mary Fletcher Vane | Trustee | 07 June 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Kathleen Elizabeth Plumley MA | Trustee | 23 April 2017 |
|
|
||||||
Michael Norman De La Hunt | Trustee | 23 April 2017 |
|
|
||||||
IZZY MCDONALD-BOOTH | Trustee | 31 May 2012 |
|
|
||||||
JOAN ELIZABETH GRENFELL | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £189.24k | £185.83k | £266.94k | £269.90k | £283.14k | |
|
Total expenditure | £186.87k | £179.29k | £303.04k | £239.77k | £246.96k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £1.80k | N/A | £450 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £5.00k | £12.69k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 03 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 03 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 22 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 22 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 12 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 12 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 19 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 19 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 29 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 29 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES
Charitable objects
Promoting in the ecclesiastical parish the whole mission of the Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Parish Office
St. Georges Close
NEWCASTLE UPON TYNE
NE2 2TF
- Phone:
- 01912811659
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window