Financial history COSELEY FELLOWSHIP OF THE PHYSICALLY HANDICAPPED

Charity number: 500499
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 28/02/2013 28/02/2014 28/02/2015 28/02/2016 28/02/2017
Total gross income £5.98k £5.10k £5.14k £5.30k £4.62k
Total expenditure £6.30k £6.76k £5.44k £4.62k £4.66k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A