ROMFORD AUTISTIC GROUP SUPPORT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
RAGS offers a support network for families who have a child or young person with Autism/Asperger's Syndrome. Our board of trustees is made up of local parents and professionals in the field of Autism. RAGS welcomes siblings and those awaiting diagnosis. Information advice and guidance is available along with events and activities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Disability
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Provides Services
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Other Charitable Activities
- Barking And Dagenham
- Essex
- Havering
- Redbridge
- Thurrock
Governance
- 31 December 2009: Standard registration
- RAGS (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sarah Son-sawyer | Trustee | 31 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Linda Taylor | Trustee | 31 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Louise Bass | Trustee | 24 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Siedah Weekes | Trustee | 11 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Cheryl Mayhew | Trustee | 27 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Mary Harvey | Trustee | 25 September 2023 |
|
|||||
Angela Kerrigan | Trustee | 01 October 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £9.05k | £2.13k | £6.44k | £12.90k | £8.22k | |
|
Total expenditure | £10.57k | £3.81k | £6.41k | £5.09k | £6.67k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £5.00k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 30 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 16 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 28 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 10 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 07 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 30/11/2009 AS AMENDED ON 24/04/2010 AS AMENDED ON 12/12/2011
Charitable objects
1 ASSISTING WITH ACCESS TO EDUCATION, TRAINING AND RESOURCES IN THE COMMUNITY; 2 PROVIDING SUPPORT TO PARENTS, CARERS OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE WITH AUTISM; 3 WORKING ACROSS THE COMMUNITY TO DEVELOP THE SERVICES NEEDED; 4 REPRESENTING THE VIEW OF PARENTS, CARERS OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE WITH AUTISM.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Koru and FIG Offices
90 Taunton Road
Harold Hill
Romford
RM3 7SU
- Phone:
- 07874999280
- Email:
- info@ragshavering.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window