THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF NORTHALLERTON

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Religious activities in the Church of England Northallerton North Yorkshire
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £2,255 from 2 government grant(s)
People

19 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- North Yorkshire
Governance
- 21 August 2009: Previously excepted registration
- 01 October 2021: Funds received from 514433 THE FRIENDS OF THE PARISH CHURCH OF ALL SAINTS NOR...
- NORTHALLERTON PCC (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
19 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ian Charles Gatto | Trustee | 23 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Victoria Smith | Trustee | 17 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
BARRY ADAMS | Trustee | 15 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL HOWARD KITCHING | Trustee | 15 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sheila Toomer | Trustee | 16 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Wim Paul Bakker | Trustee | 16 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sheila Elizabeth Anne Fowler | Trustee | 16 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rev Claire Louise Soderman | Trustee | 01 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Joyce Hogg | Trustee | 10 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Julia Staves | Trustee | 10 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
John Edmund Slaughter | Trustee | 26 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Susan Helen Adsett | Trustee | 26 October 2020 |
|
|||||
Diana Helen Joy Lee | Trustee | 01 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Rev David Johnson | Trustee | 01 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Mary Lappin | Trustee | 16 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
IAN CHARLES SMITHSON | Trustee | 25 July 2017 |
|
|||||
Angus Stewart Deas | Trustee | 16 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
MR PETER ANDREW | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MICHAEL SMITH | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £173.42k | £244.83k | £469.24k | £279.48k | £154.63k | |
|
Total expenditure | £234.01k | £207.80k | £250.47k | £222.99k | £222.79k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £43.35k | £500 | £2.26k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 03 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 03 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 22 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 22 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 25 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 25 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 21 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 21 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 22 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 22 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES
Charitable objects
Promoting in the ecclesiastical parish the whole mission of the Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
All Saints Church
High Street
Northallerton
North Yorkshire
DL7 8DJ
- Phone:
- 01609773338
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window