THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST PAUL'S, ST ALBANS

Charity number: 1131697
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

PROVISION OF RELIGIOUS AND CHARITABLE SUPPORT IN THE PARISH OF ST PAUL'S ST ALBANS

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

One or more trustees receive payments or benefits from the charity for providing services to the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Hertfordshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 18 September 2009: Previously excepted registration
Organisation type:
Previously excepted
Other names:
  • ST PAUL'S PCC, ST ALBANS (Working name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

21 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Helen Chilton Trustee 28 April 2024
None on record
Laura Bull Trustee 28 April 2024
None on record
dr Robert William Moerman Trustee 11 May 2023
None on record
James Robert Wright Trustee 11 May 2023
None on record
Babatunde Idowu Trustee 11 May 2023
None on record
Brandon Solomon Trustee 11 May 2023
None on record
David William Hardisty Trustee 11 May 2023
None on record
Jon Evans Trustee 11 May 2023
None on record
PAUL LAWRENCE Trustee 27 March 2022
None on record
CAROLINE MARGARET WILKINS Trustee 27 March 2022
None on record
KATHRYN RUTH WALKER Trustee 27 March 2022
None on record
Rev JOHN ERNEST TREGALE Trustee 01 September 2021
ST PAUL'S CHURCH TRUST
Received: On time
Rev DIANE RUTH TREGALE Trustee 01 September 2021
None on record
ADENIKE FAKOYA Trustee 28 March 2021
None on record
Eleanor Cook Trustee 25 March 2021
None on record
Rev Peter George Crumpler Trustee 25 March 2021
None on record
George Tsafandakis Trustee 25 March 2021
None on record
Luke Fletcher Trustee 29 September 2020
None on record
Rachel Laanest Trustee 10 September 2020
None on record
Justyn David Evans Trustee 10 September 2020
None on record
NICHOLAS SALISBURY Trustee 27 September 2013
ST PAUL'S CHURCH TRUST
Received: On time
THE SCOPS ARTS TRUST
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £534.12k £555.96k £527.94k £591.90k £683.81k
Total expenditure £561.26k £513.28k £554.98k £547.19k £596.80k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £6.81k £2.75k N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £511.68k £504.69k £458.80k £488.67k £585.42k
Income - Other trading activities £15.96k £29.94k £60.04k £81.06k £69.65k
Income - Charitable activities £4.10k £2.83k £5.86k £7.56k £11.21k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £2.37k £1.12k £3.24k £14.61k £17.54k
Income - Other £0 £17.38k £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £10.00k £0 £0 £0 £35.00k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £561.26k £513.28k £554.98k £547.19k £596.80k
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £5.20k £5.30k £5.74k £6.12k £6.45k
Expenditure - Grants institution £95.70k £72.20k £81.67k £72.62k £81.25k
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Own use assets £3.97m £3.96m £3.95m £3.94m £3.94m
Long-term investments £32.16k £36.74k £32.43k £34.97k £36.32k
Other assets £334.68k £405.45k £389.03k £431.95k £530.04k
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total liabilities £23.33k £29.05k £34.87k £22.87k £26.72k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2024 06 April 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2024 06 April 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2023 26 May 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 26 May 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 12 August 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 12 August 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 20 April 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 20 April 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 10 November 2021 10 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 10 November 2021 10 days late Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
St. Pauls Church Office
Blandford Road
ST. ALBANS
Hertfordshire
AL1 4JP
Phone:
01727846281
Website:

stpauls-stalbans.org