Derbyshire North East Methodist Circuit

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Methodist Circuit is a local organisation which supports and guides the work of all Methodist churches within the Derbyshire North East area, in accordance with The Constitutional Practice and Discipline of the Methodist Church.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

55 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Other Charitable Activities
- Derbyshire
Governance
- 27 January 2010: Previously excepted registration
- 15 September 2020: Funds received from 1131231 BOLSOVER AND STAVELEY METHODIST CIRCUIT
- CHESTERFIELD METHODIST CIRCUIT (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
55 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Stephen Richard Pointer | Trustee | 26 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Alexander Thomas Nathaniel Bradley | Trustee | 26 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Celia Sumatee Ramnath | Trustee | 26 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Emma Louise Green | Trustee | 26 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca Swallow | Trustee | 09 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Thomas William Surgay | Trustee | 18 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Bradley Thomas Billy Goddon-Smith | Trustee | 16 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Heather Bernice Nicklin | Trustee | 08 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Susan Catherine Walker | Trustee | 24 June 2024 |
|
|||||
Deborah Andrews | Trustee | 18 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Reginald Rodda | Trustee | 17 June 2024 |
|
|||||
Louise Ann Mount | Trustee | 07 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan Hood | Trustee | 19 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Patrick John Sabin | Trustee | 12 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jean Metcalfe | Trustee | 15 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Lois Newton | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Norma Graham | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Teresa Clarke | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
David Green | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Jill Gertrude Ramsdale | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
David Henry Slater | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Rev Mark Carrick | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Glenys May Clinton | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|||||
Norman William Buck | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Linda Wickins | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Rev GEOFFREY MAXWELL FISHER | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Rev RICHARD WILLIAM HARRIS | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|||||
Sarah Mount | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Ruth Sadler | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Gerard Eric Vaughan | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Hazel Eileen Stimpson | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Hazel Madin | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Rowley | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|||||
John Graham Hawkins | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|||||
Allison Jane Hunt | Trustee | 11 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Steven Atkins | Trustee | 20 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Alyson Franks | Trustee | 10 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Agnes MacCall Tranter | Trustee | 03 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Malcom Ernest Webster | Trustee | 19 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
John Cowie | Trustee | 23 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
Angela June Walker | Trustee | 01 September 2016 |
|
|||||
Vivienne Anne Dent | Trustee | 01 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
Rev Michael John Bowman | Trustee | 01 June 2016 |
|
|
||||
Roger Bryan Jones | Trustee | 01 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
Hazel Collins | Trustee | 01 December 2014 |
|
|
||||
MARGARET CHINNERY | Trustee | 30 September 2013 |
|
|||||
Ruth Mary Oscroft BA | Trustee | 30 September 2013 |
|
|
||||
REV PAUL RIGBY KING BA | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
NOELINE PATRICIA WILKINS CQSW | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Gillian Mary King | Trustee |
|
||||||
FRANK HENRY BACON | Trustee |
|
||||||
VALERIE DAVIES | Trustee |
|
||||||
JOHN WALTER FIDLER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
VALERIE ANNE GRATTON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MICHAEL DAVID SPRIGGS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £189.37k | £460.30k | £712.73k | £301.69k | £348.96k | |
|
Total expenditure | £266.55k | £398.96k | £520.12k | £435.81k | £452.90k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | N/A | £35.08k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | £25.00k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | N/A | £9.31k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | N/A | £643.34k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | N/A | £5.00k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | £520.12k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | N/A | £4.69k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | N/A | £23.64k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 09 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | 09 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 29 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 29 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 23 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 23 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 27 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 27 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DEED OF UNION (1932) AND METHODIST CHURCH ACT (1976) as amended on 03 Dec 2019
Charitable objects
The purposes of the Methodist Church are and shall be deemed to have been since the date of union the advancement of - (a) the Christian faith in accordance with the doctrinal standards and the discipline of the Methodist Church; (b) any charitable purpose for the time being of any Connexional, district, circuit, local or other organisation of the Methodist Church; (c) any charitable purpose for the time being of any society or institution subsiduary or ancillary to the Methodist Church; (d) any purpose for the time being of any charity being a charity subsidiary or ancillary to the Methodist Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Central Methodist Church
38 Saltergate
CHESTERFIELD
Derbyshire
S40 1UH
- Phone:
- 01246 690005
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window