PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL FOR THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF THE KIRKBY LONSDALE TEAM MINISTRY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Enabling as many people as possible to worship in our 8 churches and to become part of the 'Rainbow Parish' community. Provision of pastoral care, developing and strengthening links with schools and youth organisations, encouraging people to consider all types of lay ministry, participation in local events that build and enrich community life, welcoming a variety of uses for our church buildings.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

24 Trustee(s)
150 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Cumbria
Governance
- 25 September 2009: Previously excepted registration
- KIRKBY LONSDALE PCC (Working name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
24 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Rebecca Gilbert | Trustee | 27 October 2024 |
|
|
||||||||
Christina Joan Allen | Trustee | 29 May 2024 |
|
|
||||||||
Wendy Elizabeth Hadwin | Trustee | 29 May 2024 |
|
|
||||||||
Rachel Mary Pedley | Trustee | 23 May 2023 |
|
|
||||||||
Jayne Wilson | Trustee | 23 May 2023 |
|
|
||||||||
Paula Hall | Trustee | 22 October 2020 |
|
|
||||||||
Nick Hall | Trustee | 22 October 2020 |
|
|
||||||||
Margaret Venys | Trustee | 11 September 2018 |
|
|
||||||||
Anne Dehany | Trustee | 10 April 2018 |
|
|
||||||||
Alan Cox | Trustee | 16 November 2017 |
|
|
||||||||
WENDY ANN THORNTON | Trustee | 27 September 2017 |
|
|
||||||||
STEPHEN JAMES EVANS | Trustee | 27 April 2016 |
|
|
||||||||
MARY mCkENDRICK BLANCHARD | Trustee | 15 June 2015 |
|
|
||||||||
Gillian Audrey Sykes | Trustee | 09 June 2015 |
|
|||||||||
Sue Sanderson | Trustee | 21 April 2015 |
|
|
||||||||
ANNE ELIZABETH PETTIFOR | Trustee | 18 September 2014 |
|
|
||||||||
JEAN ANN FRY | Trustee | 21 March 2014 |
|
|
||||||||
ANNE FOULERTON | Trustee | 13 March 2014 |
|
|
||||||||
LIZ DEW | Trustee | 17 March 2013 |
|
|
||||||||
MERLIN ANDREW HIBBS | Trustee | 11 December 2011 |
|
|
||||||||
ARTHUR EDWARD OAKDEN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||||
CHARLES EDWARD HOWARTH | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||||
Rev RICHARD JOHN SNOW | Trustee |
|
||||||||||
MARGARET LAMBERT | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £300.74k | £326.37k | £249.76k | £279.33k | £220.82k | |
|
Total expenditure | £260.57k | £234.59k | £245.91k | £291.43k | £351.73k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £4.01k | £7.96k | £4.48k | £3.87k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 04 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 04 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 24 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 24 September 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 07 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 07 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 25 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 25 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 02 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 02 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES
Charitable objects
Promoting in the ecclesiastical parish the whole mission of the Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
17 Mitchelgate
Kirkby Lonsdale
Carnforth
LA6 2BE
- Phone:
- 01524271218
- Email:
- office@therainbowparish.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window