Trustees PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL FOR THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF THE KIRKBY LONSDALE TEAM MINISTRY

Charity number: 1131834
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

24 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev Rebecca Gilbert Trustee 27 October 2024
None on record
Christina Joan Allen Trustee 29 May 2024
None on record
Wendy Elizabeth Hadwin Trustee 29 May 2024
None on record
Rachel Mary Pedley Trustee 23 May 2023
None on record
Jayne Wilson Trustee 23 May 2023
None on record
Paula Hall Trustee 22 October 2020
None on record
Nick Hall Trustee 22 October 2020
None on record
Margaret Venys Trustee 11 September 2018
None on record
Anne Dehany Trustee 10 April 2018
None on record
Alan Cox Trustee 16 November 2017
None on record
WENDY ANN THORNTON Trustee 27 September 2017
None on record
STEPHEN JAMES EVANS Trustee 27 April 2016
None on record
MARY mCkENDRICK BLANCHARD Trustee 15 June 2015
None on record
Gillian Audrey Sykes Trustee 09 June 2015
CASTERTON VILLAGE HALL
Received: On time
CUMBRIA-WESTMORLAND FEDERATION OF WOMEN'S INSTITUTES
Received: On time
POOR'S LAND
Received: On time
THE FAIRBANK SOCIETY
Received: On time
Sue Sanderson Trustee 21 April 2015
None on record
ANNE ELIZABETH PETTIFOR Trustee 18 September 2014
None on record
JEAN ANN FRY Trustee 21 March 2014
None on record
ANNE FOULERTON Trustee 13 March 2014
None on record
LIZ DEW Trustee 17 March 2013
None on record
MERLIN ANDREW HIBBS Trustee 11 December 2011
None on record
ARTHUR EDWARD OAKDEN Trustee
None on record
CHARLES EDWARD HOWARTH Trustee
None on record
Rev RICHARD JOHN SNOW Trustee
CHURCHES TOGETHER IN CUMBRIA
Received: On time
KIRKBY LONSDALE RELIEF IN NEED CHARITY
Received: On time
MARGARET LAMBERT Trustee
None on record