THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF CHRIST CHURCH, SOUTHGATE

Charity number: 1131606
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Promoting in the ecclesiastical parish the whole mission of the Church.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £286,643
Total expenditure: £270,528

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Enfield

Governance

Registration history:
  • 14 September 2009: Previously excepted registration
Organisation type:
Previously excepted
Other names:
  • CHRIST CHURCH SOUTHGATE PCC (Working name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

19 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev CHRICHTON LIMBERT Chair 09 September 2015
THE BAIRD MEMORIAL HOMES
Received: On time
SOPHIA WALKER'S DAY AND SUNDAY SCHOOL CHARITY
Received: On time
Christopher Raymond Patrick Chessum Trustee 26 May 2024
None on record
Sophie Victoria Cook Trustee 26 May 2024
None on record
Stephen Martin Limbert-Mason Trustee 26 May 2024
None on record
Youla Adela Hadjidaniel Trustee 26 May 2024
None on record
Freya Elizabeth Anne Carroll Trustee 28 May 2023
None on record
Graham Richard Cook Trustee 28 May 2023
None on record
Patricia Frances Hawkins Trustee 28 May 2023
None on record
Rev Paul Ellerby Trustee 03 July 2022
None on record
Imogen Frances Cooper Trustee 29 May 2022
None on record
Catherine Rachel Anne Carroll Trustee 25 October 2020
THE BAIRD MEMORIAL HOMES
Received: On time
Ms Clare Boulton Trustee 30 April 2017
A M BAIRD FOR BENEFIT OF LIVING OF CHRIST CHURCH
Received: On time
A M BAIRD FOR EXPENSES OF CHRIST CHURCH
Received: On time
WELD CHAPEL TRUST FUND
Received: On time
Sandra Anderson Trustee 30 April 2016
None on record
Dr ANGELA MARY PARKER Trustee 01 September 2015
None on record
Dr RONALD LO Trustee 12 May 2013
A M BAIRD FOR BENEFIT OF LIVING OF CHRIST CHURCH
Received: On time
A M BAIRD FOR EXPENSES OF CHRIST CHURCH
Received: On time
WELD CHAPEL TRUST FUND
Received: On time
REV HAZEL MIALL Trustee 09 May 2013
None on record
Dr PATRICIA ASHBY Trustee 06 May 2013
None on record
HILARY JOY MEUR Trustee
None on record
MS JACKIE ANDERSON Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £263.68k £195.89k £226.02k £259.47k £286.64k
Total expenditure £350.44k £231.45k £234.79k £285.03k £270.53k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £10.00k £1.71k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 16 September 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 16 September 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 25 July 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 25 July 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 26 June 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 26 June 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 28 September 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 28 September 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 25 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 25 October 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
1 THE GREEN
LONDON
N14 7EG
Phone:
02088820917