THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST. PETER'S TITCHFIELD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Regular public worship open to all. The provision of a sacred space for personal prayer and contemplation. Pastoral work, including visiting the sick and bereaved.Teaching Christianity through sermons, courses and small groups. Promoting the whole mission of the Church through provision of activities for senior citizens,parents and toddlers and other special groups. Supporting other charities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

10 Trustee(s)
100 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Hampshire
Governance
- 23 September 2009: Previously excepted registration
- ST. PETER'S TITCHFIELD PCC (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Steven Duncan Sherwood | Chair | 30 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
David Malcolm Mugford | Trustee | 06 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Linda Mary Kelly | Trustee | 06 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Richard Trevithick | Trustee | 20 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Helen Perry | Trustee | 18 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Martin Stewart Reid | Trustee | 18 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
Hazel Mary Croft - Phillips | Trustee | 30 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Paul William Wenham | Trustee | 02 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Christopher George Oakley | Trustee | 02 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Rev Janet Trevithick | Trustee | 29 April 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £133.89k | £104.53k | £106.24k | £105.42k | £104.75k | |
|
Total expenditure | £120.01k | £111.23k | £79.24k | £125.38k | £101.50k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £3.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 12 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 12 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 12 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 05 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 18 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 18 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 03 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 03 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 14 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 14 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES
Charitable objects
Promoting in the ecclesiastical parish the whole mission of the Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
34 Vicarage Lane
FAREHAM
Hampshire
PO14 2LA
- Phone:
- 01329668957
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window