EMMANUEL BAPTIST CHURCH, SWANAGE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Religious activities to all age groups, to include people with disabilities and to other charities and voluntary organisations.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

10 Trustee(s)
40 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityOne or more of the employees were formerly trustees
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Dorset
Governance
- 26 January 2010: Previously excepted registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Pamela Sealey | Trustee | 19 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
ALISON SNELL | Trustee | 19 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Janet Norley | Trustee | 19 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rev Graham Holliday | Trustee | 19 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Richard Penny | Trustee | 18 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Peter David Collins | Trustee | 18 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Douglas Clutterbuck | Trustee | 18 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ian Snell | Trustee | 01 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Helen Rochelle | Trustee | 01 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Richard Docherty | Trustee | 01 January 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £302.79k | £558.75k | £163.94k | £156.40k | £173.09k | |
|
Total expenditure | £279.59k | £190.88k | £156.85k | £131.83k | £149.72k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | £558.75k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | £190.88k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | £500 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 11 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 11 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 12 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 12 September 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 09 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 09 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 16 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 16 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 30 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 30 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 01 JANUARY 1905
Charitable objects
The principal purpose of the Church is the advancement of the Christian faith according to the principles of the Baptist denomination. The Church may also advance education and carry out other charitable purposes in the United Kingdom and/or other parts of the world.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Emmanuel Baptist Church
160 Victoria Avenue
SWANAGE
BH19 1AZ
- Phone:
- 01929427706
- Email:
- contact@emmanuelbc.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window