Governing document VISITORS CENTRE, WINSON GREEN
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 22 OCTOBER 1970 AS AMENDED 29 OCTOBER 1979, 19 JANUARY 1981, 16 APRIL 1986, 6 DECEMBER 1988, 10 AUGUST 1989 AND 11 JULY 1995.
Charitable objects
RELIEF OF POVERTY, HARDSHIP AND DISTRESS AMONG FAMILIES, AND THOSE WHO ARE CONCERNED WITH THE PRISONER'S WELFARE OR WHOSE WELFARE IS AFFECTED BY HIS IMPRISIONMENT AND DEPENDANTS OF PERSONS WHO HAVE SUFFERED A LEGAL RESTRICTION OF THEIR LIBERTY AND WHO ARE, OR HAVE BEEN, DETAINED AT HER MAJESTY'S PRISON BIRMINGHAM.
Area of benefit
BIRMINGHAM AND DISTRICT
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.