FRIENDS OF MYTON POOL TRUST LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Company's objectives are the regeneration and maintenance of Myton Pool and its surrounds as wildlife habitats for the public benefit.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Warwickshire
Governance
- 08 January 2010: Standard registration
- FROMP (Working name)
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Melissa Betony Hughes | Trustee | 28 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Neal Leigh Hughes | Trustee | 28 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Maureen Elizabeth Nicholas | Trustee | 24 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
MRS SUSAN CHALLIS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MR CHRIS SHELTON | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.79k | £2.35k | £4.90k | £7.46k | £4.54k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.50k | £1.61k | £4.08k | £3.27k | £3.15k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 01 July 2024 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 29 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 27 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 18 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 28 October 2020 | 120 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 27 JUNE 2009 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION 3 DECEMBER 2009
Charitable objects
A TO PROMOTE FOR THE BENEFITS OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE AREA AROUND MYTON POOL IN WARWICK, UK AND BEYOND, THE REGENERATION AND MAINTENANCE OF MYTON POOL AND ITS SURROUNDS AS A RECREATION AREA FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITION OF LIFE OF THE SAID INHABITANTS. B TO PROMOTE THE PRESERVATION AND CONSERVATION OF THE WILDLIFE AND HABITATS OF MYTON POOL AND ITS SURROUNDS FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFITS.
Area of benefit
MYTON POOL IN WARWICK, UK AND BEYOND,
Contact information
- Address:
-
20 Bennett Drive
WARWICK
CV34 6QJ
- Phone:
- 01926713016
- Email:
- frompsecretary@fromp.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window