THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF SAINT JOHN NEWLAND, HULL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The PCC has the responsibility of promoting in the ecclesiastical parish of St. John Newland the mission, worship and pastoral ministry of the Church of England.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

8 Trustee(s)
8 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- East Riding Of Yorkshire
- Kingston Upon Hull City
Governance
- 24 August 2009: Previously excepted registration
- ST JOHN NEWLAND, HULL (Working name)
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Richard Stanley White | Chair | 28 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Pamela Elizabeth Norton | Trustee | 07 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Joanne Frankton | Trustee | 07 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Michael Donald John Donaldson | Trustee | 07 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Helen Joanne Robinson | Trustee | 07 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Joy Ingrid Donaldson | Trustee | 07 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Hannah Margaret Turvey | Trustee | 07 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Lyn Rachel Frankton-Booth | Trustee | 07 November 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £295.15k | £162.20k | £38.51k | £272.52k | £97.21k | |
|
Total expenditure | £293.66k | £167.38k | £27.67k | £97.66k | £197.04k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 19 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 19 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 22 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 22 September 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 29 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 29 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 03 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 03 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 18 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 18 August 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES
Charitable objects
Promoting in the ecclesiastical parish the whole mission of the Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
14 Silverdale Road
HULL
HU6 7HQ
- Phone:
- 07565544234
- Email:
- info@stjohnnewland.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window