Epworth Scunthorpe and Gainsborough Methodist Circuit

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Other charitable activities
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

43 Trustee(s)
100 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Lincolnshire
- North Lincolnshire
Governance
- 26 January 2010: Previously excepted registration
- EPWORTH AND SCUNTHORPE METHODIST CIRCUIT (Previous name)
- SCUNTHORPE METHODIST CIRCUIT (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
43 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Victoria Atkinson | Chair | 01 September 2021 |
|
|
||||||||
Timothy John Smith | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|
||||||||
AUBREY LINDLEY | Trustee | 06 September 2022 |
|
|
||||||||
KEITH BOARDMAN | Trustee | 06 September 2022 |
|
|
||||||||
ROBERT SHEARD | Trustee | 06 June 2022 |
|
|
||||||||
Valerie Hackney | Trustee | 06 June 2022 |
|
|
||||||||
Catheryn Holmes | Trustee | 06 September 2021 |
|
|
||||||||
Lillian Pollard | Trustee | 06 June 2021 |
|
|
||||||||
Peter Jackson | Trustee | 06 June 2021 |
|
|
||||||||
MAI LIN GRIMBLEBY | Trustee | 06 June 2021 |
|
|
||||||||
Christine Allison | Trustee | 06 June 2021 |
|
|
||||||||
Louise Howard | Trustee | 06 June 2021 |
|
|
||||||||
HAZEL JACKSON | Trustee | 06 June 2021 |
|
|
||||||||
Dr John Lambert | Trustee | 06 June 2021 |
|
|||||||||
Bronwen Braisdell BA BA | Trustee | 06 June 2021 |
|
|||||||||
Virginia Isitt | Trustee | 06 June 2021 |
|
|
||||||||
Lawrie Holtby | Trustee | 30 March 2020 |
|
|
||||||||
Coralie Joy Lockwood | Trustee | 20 March 2020 |
|
|
||||||||
ANDREW BAMFORD | Trustee | 01 September 2017 |
|
|
||||||||
Rev A Long | Trustee | 01 September 2016 |
|
|||||||||
REV PAUL WILLIAM BRAISDELL | Trustee | 01 September 2015 |
|
|
||||||||
Kevin Wilbur | Trustee | 01 September 2014 |
|
|
||||||||
Arthur Wilkinson Dawson | Trustee | 11 March 2014 |
|
|
||||||||
Valerie Eileen Cochrane | Trustee | 01 September 2012 |
|
|
||||||||
Rev STUART GUNSON | Trustee | 01 September 2012 |
|
|
||||||||
Andrew Lockwood | Trustee | 01 September 2012 |
|
|
||||||||
Pamela Layton | Trustee | 01 September 2012 |
|
|
||||||||
LORRAINE SMITH | Trustee | 09 August 2011 |
|
|
||||||||
PATRICIA DIANE BRIGGS | Trustee | 09 August 2011 |
|
|
||||||||
BETTY OLDRIDGE | Trustee | 09 August 2011 |
|
|
||||||||
MARILYN DENISE HALL | Trustee | 09 August 2011 |
|
|
||||||||
MRS MERLE DICK | Trustee | 09 August 2011 |
|
|
||||||||
MRS CMR DRUMMOND | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||||
MRS SUZANNE LYNAUGH FCA | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||||
MRS JE STOCKS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||||
MRS PA KIRK | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||||
MR WA MAW | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||||
MRS M ATKINSON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||||
MRS IA BELL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||||
MR M WHITE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||||
MRS CM WOOD | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||||
MR JH CREDLAND | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||||
MR D SANDERSON | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £204.12k | £205.60k | £340.94k | £608.33k | £196.15k | |
|
Total expenditure | £241.90k | £243.11k | £276.94k | £271.36k | £321.12k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | N/A | N/A | £4.00k | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £178.26k | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | N/A | N/A | £19.83k | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | N/A | N/A | £406.24k | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | N/A | N/A | £4.00k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £249.13k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | N/A | £18.78k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | N/A | N/A | £50.51k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | N/A | N/A | £12.07k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | N/A | N/A | £9.36k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | N/A | N/A | £3.46k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 10 October 2024 | 102 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 10 October 2024 | 102 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 26 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 26 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 24 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 24 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 24 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 24 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 24 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 24 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DEED OF UNION (1932) AND THE METHODIST CHURCH ACT (1976) as amended on 29 Jun 2023
Charitable objects
The purposes of the Methodist Church are and shall be deemed to have been since the date of union the advancement of - (a) the Christian faith in accordance with the doctrinal standards and the discipline of the Methodist Church; (b) any charitable purpose for the time being of any Connexional, district, circuit, local or other organisation of the Methodist Church; (c) any charitable purpose for the time being of any society or institution subsiduary or ancillary to the Methodist Church; (d) any purpose for the time being of any charity being a charity subsidiary or ancillary to the Methodist Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
37 HIGH STREET
EPWORTH
DONCASTER
DN9 1EP
- Phone:
- 01427872319
- Email:
- angela.long@methodist.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window