QUEENS ROAD BAPTIST CHURCH BROADSTAIRS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
regular public worship; prayer Bible study preaching and teaching baptism; Communion; evangelism and mission; teaching encouragement; youth work; Christian discipling education and training for Christian and community service; giving and encouraging pastoral care; supporting and encouraging charitable social action in the United Kingdom and abroad
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

10 Trustee(s)
300 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Kent
Governance
- 01 October 2009: Previously excepted registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Christopher John James Matthewman | Trustee | 24 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Natasha Leanne Jones | Trustee | 20 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Chris George | Trustee | 21 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Roy Corker | Trustee | 18 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Marianne Hooper | Trustee | 29 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Michelle Jackson | Trustee | 22 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
TERESA FISHER | Trustee | 12 March 2013 |
|
|
||||
Peter Verrall | Trustee | 21 July 2012 |
|
|
||||
Rev SAMUEL HEARLE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
GILLIAN CORKER | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £403.60k | £249.29k | £251.00k | £262.62k | £313.07k | |
|
Total expenditure | £394.93k | £264.06k | £233.55k | £283.23k | £311.90k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 25 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 25 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 06 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 06 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 19 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 19 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 21 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 21 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 15 JULY 2009
Charitable objects
The principal purpose of the Church is the advancement of the Christian faith according to the principles of the Baptist denomination. The Church may also advance education and carry out other charitable purposes in the United Kingdom and/or other parts of the world.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
QUEENS ROAD BAPTIST CHURCH
QUEENS ROAD
BROADSTAIRS
CT10 1NU
- Phone:
- 01843861055
- Email:
- churchoffice@qrbc.net
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window