Trustees QUEENS ROAD BAPTIST CHURCH BROADSTAIRS
Charity number: 1131955

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Christopher John James Matthewman | Trustee | 24 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Natasha Leanne Jones | Trustee | 20 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Chris George | Trustee | 21 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Roy Corker | Trustee | 18 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Marianne Hooper | Trustee | 29 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Michelle Jackson | Trustee | 22 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
TERESA FISHER | Trustee | 12 March 2013 |
|
|
||||
Peter Verrall | Trustee | 21 July 2012 |
|
|
||||
Rev SAMUEL HEARLE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
GILLIAN CORKER | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.