THE METHODIST CHURCH - CHESTER AND STOKE-ON-TRENT DISTRICT

Charity Number: 1132237
Charity reporting is up to date (43 days late)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The provision of public acts of worship and sacred space for prayer. The teaching of Christianity through sermons, courses, special events and small groups. The resourcing, encouragement and disciplining of Methodist work in the District. Promoting an interest in the work and influence of Primitive Methodism. Providing public access to Christian books and worship materials.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Services
  • Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
Where the charity operates:
  • Cheshire East
  • Cheshire West & Chester
  • Halton
  • Shropshire
  • Staffordshire
  • Stoke-on-trent City

Governance

Registration history:
  • 21 October 2009: Previously excepted registration
Organisation type:
Previously excepted
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

18 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Jane Ratcliffe Trustee 01 September 2022
STAFFORDSHIRE MOORLANDS METHODIST CIRCUIT
Received: On time
AMY WYATT Trustee 01 September 2022
STOKE ON TRENT MISSION CIRCUIT
Received: 4 days late
DANIEL KEEN Trustee 01 September 2022
NEWCASTLE UNDER LYME FESTIVAL FOR MUSIC SPEECH & DRAMA ASSOCIATION
Received: On time
CAROLYN LAWRENCE Trustee 01 September 2022
None on record
Rev DAVID WILLIS Trustee 01 September 2022
None on record
Rev ELIZABETH SINGLETON Trustee 01 September 2022
None on record
Rev Kathryn Stephens Trustee 01 September 2021
MIDDLEPORT MATTERS COMMUNITY TRUST
Recently registered
STOKE ON TRENT MISSION CIRCUIT
Received: 4 days late
BURSLEM METHODIST MISSION (SWAN BANK)
Received: On time
Rev ROBERT HILTON Trustee 01 September 2021
None on record
Rev YVONNE PEARSON Trustee 01 September 2021
None on record
David John Pickles Trustee 01 September 2019
Methodist Central Hall, Manchester
Received: 2 days late
DANE AND TRENT METHODIST CIRCUIT
Received: On time
POTTERIES CHRISTIAN BOOKSHOP
Recently registered
Rev Helen Ruth Kirk Trustee 01 September 2019
CHURCHES TOGETHER IN CHESHIRE
Received: On time
Rev Timothy Paul Simms Trustee 01 September 2019
None on record
Rev Peter Hancock Trustee 01 September 2018
None on record
SALLY GRAHAM Trustee 01 September 2017
None on record
Glenn Gerald Parkes Trustee 01 September 2017
None on record
VALERIE ANN MAYERS Trustee 01 September 2016
None on record
Ian Christopher White Trustee 19 October 2012
None on record
REV PATRICIA ANN BILLSBORROW Trustee 26 July 2011
MID CHESHIRE METHODIST CIRCUIT
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £978.28k £1.01m £1.59m £1.15m £1.24m
Total expenditure £1.25m £915.57k £988.97k £1.10m £1.18m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £19.92k N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £736.47k £997.84k £1.50m £1.09m £1.20m
Income - Other trading activities £227.34k £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £14.47k £7.73k £25.56k £40.84k £36.95k
Income - Other £0 £0 £57.18k £19.92k £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.25m £915.05k £988.40k £1.10m £1.18m
Expenditure - Raising funds £629 £519 £577 £2.37k £2.67k
Expenditure - Governance £2.77k £0 £0 £1.78k £1.75k
Expenditure - Grants institution £472.07k £0 £0 £696.75k £733.66k
Expenditure - Investment management £629 £0 £0 £2.37k £2.67k
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Own use assets £519.52k £518.97k £1.05m £517.91k £517.69k
Long-term investments £0 £0 £0 £439.07k £384.83k
Other assets £590.33k £632.30k £747.14k £856.02k £957.53k
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total liabilities £8.24k £14.18k £6.06k £9.64k £11.58k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 12 August 2024 43 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 12 August 2024 43 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2022 09 August 2024 406 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 09 August 2024 406 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2021 29 March 2023 272 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 21 September 2022 83 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2020 25 June 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 22 June 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2019 29 June 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 23 June 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Methodist District Centre
Bishops Wood
Nantwich
CW5 7QD
Phone:
01270627774