SOCIAL ORGANISATION FOR UNITY AND LEISURE (SOUL)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The main work for SOUL is to organise support young people through providing activities for children from disadvantaged backgrounds.This includes, Sports, social and economic programmes. we hope to engage young people through creative methods, to keep them off the streets and away from ASB and into positive routes, through workshops, employment and education support.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 March 2024
Total income includes £399,556 from 2 government contract(s)
People

6 Trustee(s)
60 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Throughout London
Governance
- 04 January 2010: Standard registration
- 14 October 2013: Removed (Does not operate)
- 06 January 2014: Re-registered
- SOUL (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Shamim Miah | Chair | 21 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
Sufia Alam | Trustee | 15 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Tomas Tadese Kefela | Trustee | 13 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jamil Trofder | Trustee | 13 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Tamanna Begum | Trustee | 13 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
SHIPON MIAH | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/03/2020 | 30/03/2021 | 30/03/2022 | 30/03/2023 | 30/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £11.50k | £58.56k | £181.59k | £308.06k | £451.44k | |
|
Total expenditure | £9.53k | £58.10k | £176.08k | £303.19k | £447.13k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | £232.69k | £399.56k | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £121.72k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 March 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 March 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 March 2023 | 20 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 March 2023 | 20 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 March 2022 | 24 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 March 2022 | 27 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 March 2021 | 12 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 March 2021 | 12 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 March 2020 | 23 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 15 AUGUST 2009 AS AMENDED 2 JANUARY 2010 as amended on 13 Dec 2020
Charitable objects
TO ACT AS A RESOURCE FOR YOUNG PEOPLE UP TO THE AGE OF 21 LIVING IN TOWER HAMLETS BY PROVIDING ADVICE AND ASSISTANCE AND ORGANISING PROGRAMMES OF PHYSICAL, EDUCATIONAL AND OTHER ACTIVITIES AS A MEANS OF; A ADVANCING IN LIFE AND HELPING YOUNG PEOPLE BY DEVELOPING THEIR SKILLS, CAPACITIES AND CAPABILITIES TO ENABLE THEM TO PARTICIPATE IN SOCIETY AS INDEPENDENT, MATURE AND RESPONSIBLE INDIVIDUALS; B ADVANCING EDUCATION; C RELIEVING UNEMPLOYMENT; D PROVIDING RECREATIONAL AND LEISURE TIME ACTIVITY IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR PEOPLE LIVING IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT WHO HAVE NEED BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABILITY, POVERTY OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES WITH A VIEW TO IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF SUCH PERSONS.
Area of benefit
TOWER HAMLETS
Contact information
- Address:
-
Collingwood Community Centre
Orion House
Barnsley Street
LONDON
E1 5RB
- Phone:
- 02080641351
- Email:
- info@souluk.co.uk
- Website:
-
souluk.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window