THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF WEST KIRBY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Regular public worship open to all. The provision of sacred space for prayer and contemplation. Pastoral work, including visiting the sick and bereaved. Teaching Christianity through sermons, courses and small groups. Taking religious assemblies in schools. Promoting the whole mission of the the Church through activities for parents and toddlers. Supporting other charities in the UK and overseas.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

18 Trustee(s)
60 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Wirral
Governance
- 26 August 2009: Previously excepted registration
- WEST KIRBY ST BRIDGET PCC (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
18 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Alexandra Christine Williams | Chair | 09 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Anna Maria Gibson | Trustee | 21 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sir Duncan Kirkbride Nichol | Trustee | 21 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rosemary Morgan | Trustee | 21 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
David Ronald Hind | Trustee | 21 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
PATRICIA SOUTHWORTH | Trustee | 08 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Ann Ruth Holden | Trustee | 28 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Simon Richard George Trout | Trustee | 02 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
John Stanley Metcalfe | Trustee | 02 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Professor Susan Mary Rees | Trustee | 02 September 2020 |
|
|||||
Gregory Paul Buckridge | Trustee | 26 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
David Maxwell Wright | Trustee | 16 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
Susan Shaw | Trustee | 30 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
JOHN MATHEWS SMITH | Trustee | 13 March 2016 |
|
|
||||
Priscilla Bench-Capon | Trustee | 26 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
SYDNEY DAVID FORD | Trustee |
|
||||||
ANGELA DOUGLAS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
REVEREND DAVID CHESTER | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £232.18k | £184.71k | £209.52k | £215.98k | £228.09k | |
|
Total expenditure | £303.42k | £177.71k | £186.96k | £215.00k | £247.98k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £9.50k | £11.07k | £3.55k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 21 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 21 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 29 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 29 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 15 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 15 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 06 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 06 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 05 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 05 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES
Charitable objects
Promoting in the ecclesiastical parish the whole mission of the Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
St. Bridgets Centre
St. Bridgets Lane
West Kirby
WIRRAL
Merseyside
CH48 3JT
- Phone:
- 01516786201
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window