Financial history THE YORKSHIRE DERWENT TRUST LIMITED

Charity Number: 500514
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £535 £6.95k £6.44k £2.87k £6.00k
Total expenditure £424 £0 £157 £4.18k £357
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A