THE YORKSHIRE DERWENT TRUST LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Conservation of the River Derwent navigation.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- East Riding Of Yorkshire
- North Yorkshire
Governance
- 13 November 1970: Standard registration
No other names
- Investment
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PETER LEADLEY | Trustee |
|
||||||
ROGER INGHAM WOMERSLEY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Dr GRAHAM HEATON SMITH | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
HEATHER SMITH | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £535 | £6.95k | £6.44k | £2.87k | £6.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £424 | £0 | £157 | £4.18k | £357 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 03 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 12 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 16 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 20 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 10 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 25 SEPTEMBER 1970
Charitable objects
THE PRESERVATION, MAINTENANCE AND IMPROVEMENT OF CANALS, NAVIGABLE RIVERS AND INLAND WATERWAYS AND PARTICULARLY THE RIVER DERWENT IN THE COUNTY OF YORK.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED IN PRACTICE YORKSHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
Park Gate House
69A Park Road
Guiseley
Leeds
LS20 8EN
- Phone:
- 01524 849426
- Email:
- roger_womersley@sky.com
- Website:
-
Www.rogerwomersley
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window