THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST BARTHOLOMEW, CORSHAM

Charity number: 1132969
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Regular public worship open to all. Teaching of Christianity through sermons and courses. Pastoral work, including visiting the sick and bereaved. Provision of a youth club and activities for children, parents and the elderly with a Christian ethos. Supporting other charities in the UK and oversweas.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024

Total income: £122,762
Total expenditure: £98,731

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
  • Environment/conservation/heritage
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Wiltshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 25 November 2009: Previously excepted registration
  • 06 August 2018: Funds received from 261005 THE HARTHAM CHURCH CHARITABLE TRUST
Organisation type:
Previously excepted
Other names:
  • ST BARTHOLOMEW'S PCC, CORSHAM (Working name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

17 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev ANDREW ROBERT JOHNSON Chair 05 September 2011
None on record
Marrian Tamsyn Menhinick Trustee 27 April 2025
None on record
NIGEL EDWIN MILLWARD Trustee 27 April 2025
THE FRIENDS OF ST BARTHOLOMEW'S CORSHAM
Received: On time
Christine Beryl Carter Trustee 27 April 2025
THE FRIENDS OF ST BARTHOLOMEW'S CORSHAM
Received: On time
Michael Brennan Trustee 27 April 2025
None on record
Fiona Draper Trustee 21 April 2024
None on record
NEIL HOWARD PIDDUCK Trustee 21 April 2024
None on record
L'NORA ANN OLNEY Trustee 23 April 2023
None on record
Susan Mary Lambert Trustee 23 April 2023
None on record
hermione Skrine Trustee 23 April 2023
None on record
Professor Joseph Peter McGeehan CBE Trustee 23 April 2023
None on record
Nigel Christopher Jackson MBE Trustee 15 May 2022
None on record
Debbie Joy Stott Trustee 09 May 2021
None on record
JOHN ANTONY STOTT Trustee 25 April 2017
None on record
Reginald Arthur Lambert Trustee 26 April 2016
THE FRIENDS OF ST BARTHOLOMEW'S CORSHAM
Received: On time
CHRISTINE REID OBE Trustee 28 April 2015
CORSHAM SPONSORS REFUGEES
Received: On time
THE WARRINGTON HOMES LIMITED
Received: On time
ANTHONY GORDON HALL Trustee 28 April 2015
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £95.60k £130.13k £169.95k £149.62k £122.76k
Total expenditure £118.91k £118.96k £115.28k £107.17k £98.73k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £5.57k N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2024 22 April 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2024 22 April 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2023 15 May 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 15 May 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 15 May 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 15 May 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 26 September 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 26 September 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 05 November 2021 5 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 05 November 2021 5 days late Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
33 Park Lane
Corsham
SN13 9EL
Phone:
01225859202
Website:

greatercorshamchurches.org.uk