FISHPONDS BAPTIST CHURCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The main aim and objective of Fishponds Baptist Church (FBC) is Spiritual Evangelism. At the heart of the Church is its ministry to the membership, congregation, and the wider community at large in order that the messages contained in Scripture are shared and celebrated and the understanding and acceptance that Jesus Christ is the Lord and Saviour grows.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £18,651 from 1 government grant(s)
People

7 Trustee(s)
129 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Bristol City
- South Gloucestershire
Governance
- 28 August 2009: Previously excepted registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Kathleen Jinadu | Trustee | 01 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Adam Mitchell-Baker | Trustee | 26 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jason Roy Tinley | Trustee | 22 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Graeme Betts | Trustee | 21 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Madavan | Trustee | 24 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rev Mark Madavan | Trustee | 10 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
PETER WYNFORD KEENAN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £362.72k | £265.63k | £257.97k | £308.82k | £353.80k | |
|
Total expenditure | £208.17k | £231.60k | £233.20k | £252.38k | £247.15k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £18.65k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 28 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 28 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 02 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 02 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 25 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 25 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 06 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 06 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 22 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 22 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 5 JULY 2009 as amended on 21 Sep 2023
Charitable objects
The principal purpose of the Church is the advancement of the Christian faith according to the principles of the Baptist denomination. The Church may also advance education and carry out other charitable purposes in the United Kingdom and/or other parts of the world.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
Fishponds Baptist Church
Downend Road
Fishponds
BRISTOL
BS16 5AS
- Phone:
- 01179653421
- Email:
- OFFICE@FISHPONDSBAPTIST.UK
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window