Trustees FISHPONDS BAPTIST CHURCH
Charity number: 1131411

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Kathleen Jinadu | Trustee | 01 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Adam Mitchell-Baker | Trustee | 26 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jason Roy Tinley | Trustee | 22 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Graeme Betts | Trustee | 21 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Madavan | Trustee | 24 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rev Mark Madavan | Trustee | 10 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
PETER WYNFORD KEENAN | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.