1ST TIDWORTH SCOUT GROUP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Scouting takes place when young people, in partnership with adults, work together based on the values of Scouting and: 1. enjoy what they are doing and have fun, 2. take part in activities indoors and outdoors. 3. learn by doing. 4. share in spiritual reflection. 5. take responsibility and make choices.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Other Charitable Activities
- Wiltshire
Governance
- 27 August 2009: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
S Rhodes - CSL | Trustee | 03 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Mrs D Rhodes - CSL | Trustee | 04 February 1992 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £28.70k | £7.31k | £13.05k | £21.63k | £34.40k | |
|
Total expenditure | £26.11k | £11.36k | £5.09k | £16.80k | £36.10k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 113 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 29 January 2025 | 364 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 29 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 07 February 2021 | 7 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 07 February 2021 | 7 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
ROYAL CHARTER GRANTED 4 JANUARY 1912
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE DEVELOPMENT OF YOUNG PEOPLE IN ACHIEVING THEIR FULL PHYSICAL, INTELLECTUAL, SOCIAL AND SPIRITUAL POTENTIAL; AS INDIVIDUALS, AS RESPONSIBLE CITIZENS AND AS MEMBERS OF THEIR LOCAL, NATIONAL AND INTERNATIONAL COMMUNITIES
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
30 Coombe Lane
Enford
Pewsey
Wiltshire
UK
SN9 6DF
- Phone:
- 07860381269
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window