THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST JAMES, TUNBRIDGE WELLS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The members of the PCC are the Trustees of the charity and as a body are responsible for supporting the clergy in promoting the mission of the Church in the parish, evangelistic, pastoral, liturgical, social and ecumenical. It also carries the responsibility for maintaining the building of St James Church and the other property of the charity.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £43,567 from 1 government grant(s)
People

14 Trustee(s)
242 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Kent
Governance
- 21 July 2010: Standard registration
- ST JAMES PCC, TUNBRIDGE WELLS (Working name)
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Diane Adedoyin Baderin | Trustee | 27 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Adam St John Bennett | Trustee | 05 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Priscilla Dansowaa Kankam | Trustee | 28 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Tracey Nicola Appleton | Trustee | 28 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Frances Jane Shortland | Trustee | 28 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rev Caroline M A Mills | Trustee | 06 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Amanda Baker | Trustee | 23 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Andrew James Appleton | Trustee | 23 April 2023 |
|
|||||
Rev Judith Anne Hammill | Trustee | 06 September 2022 |
|
|||||
Anthony Fitzpatrick | Trustee | 05 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Sheila Anstead | Trustee | 23 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
MRS Jenny Garratt | Trustee | 23 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
SUSAN MARCELLE SCHIBLI | Trustee | 18 July 2013 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL JOHN PHILLIPS ACMA | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £456.84k | £421.64k | £383.81k | £413.90k | £479.63k | |
|
Total expenditure | £453.45k | £415.88k | £371.15k | £410.86k | £453.27k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £73.72k | £124.76k | £50.33k | £38.97k | £43.57k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 15 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 21 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 02 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 02 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 19 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 19 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 13 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 13 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 30 April 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 30 April 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CHARITY IS TO FURTHER THE RELIGIOUS AND OTHER CHARITABLE WORK OF THE CHURCH OF ENGLAND IN THE PARISH.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
St. James Church Office
Church House
Ferndale
Tunbridge Wells
TN2 3RL
- Phone:
- 01892521703
- Email:
- STJAMESCH@GMAIL.COM
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window